HI SB2271 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Department of Education school football programs to ensure that each non-new football and privately purchased football helmet and other safety equipment used in a football program is reconditioned and recertified at least once every two years. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Safety Equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 180) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3172) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-20 1:10PM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2340) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 01-31-20 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-20 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC/WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2204 (Same As) 2020-02-04 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.