HI SB2269 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Corrections, Military, & Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Corrections, Military, & Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the authorization for the Governor to negotiate with any person for the development or expansion of private in-state correctional facilities. Prohibits the establishment of private correctional facilities within the State. Allows the Governor to enter into a contract with a private entity to construct correctional facilities on public or private lands for the benefit of the State if the facilities are owned and operated by the Department of Public Safety. Repeals the authorization of the Governor to enter into a contract with a private entity for the lease or purchase of correctional facilities the entity constructs. Effective 7/30/2075. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Correctional Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 171) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2937) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Riviere. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-01-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/CPN. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2167) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/CPN. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC/CPN. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |