HI SB2267 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits purposeful harassment with the intent to prevent the taking of fish from persons who are fishing.
Title
Relating To Harassment.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-20 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2267&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2267_.HTM |