HI SB2259 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]


Requires Hawaii consumers who are required to receive a summary of rights under section 609 of the federal Fair Credit Reporting Act, to also receive a notice of their rights under Hawaii law to obtain a security freeze on their credit reports. Expands the methods by which a consumer may request a security freeze. Specifies that a consumer credit reporting agency shall not charge a fee for placing, lifting, or removing a security freeze on a consumer's credit report or for placing or removing a security freeze on a protected consumer's credit report or records. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating To Security Freezes.



2018-02-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2018-02-08SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2062) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2018-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Nishihara.
2018-01-25SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-18 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2018-01-22SenateReferred to CPH, JDC.
2018-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.


Hawaii State Sources

Bill Comments