HI SB2252 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Gives the Real Estate Commission enforcement powers over planned community associations.
Title
Planned Community Associations; Real Estate Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2619 (Same As) 2016-02-10 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2252&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2252_.HTM |