HI SB2246 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Re-Referred to EDU/CPH/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Re-Referred to EDU/CPH/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a Board of Trustees for the Hawaii School for the Deaf and Blind to establish an independent governance structure for the school.
Title
Relating To The Hawai'i School For The Deaf And Blind.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU/CPH/JDC, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to EDU/CPH, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2421 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Re-Referred to CPH/EDU, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2246&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2246_.HTM |