HI SB2239 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 1:00PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 1:00PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys for the payment of SAT or ACT registration fees for public school students in the twelfth grade, and public charter school students in the eleventh or twelfth grade, who have not taken the SAT or ACT. (SB2239 HD1)
Title
Relating To College Placement Examination Fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 1:00PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 2:00PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-18 2:30PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-18 2:00PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 802). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Galuteria Co-Chair; Espero. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Kong, Quinlan, Matsumoto. |
2018-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 567). |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1968-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, C. Lee, Souki, Todd excused (5). |
2018-03-22 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1274-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-12 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Creagan, Hashem, Ohno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Learmont, McKelvey, Quinlan. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-12-18 2:05PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 125) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2721) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2197) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |