HI SB2234 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts renewable energy systems of two megawatts or greater from the general excise tax on wholesale and retail transactions from January 1, 2011, to December 31, 2015. (SD1)
Title
General Excise Tax; Renewable Energy Systems; Exemption
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Fred Hemmings [R] | Sen. Gary Hooser [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-04 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2021) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Hooser; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kokubun, Hemmings. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-10 3:00pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Referred to ENE, WAM. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |