HI SB2226 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes business practice and transparency reporting requirements for pharmacy benefit managers. Replaces the registration requirement for pharmacy benefit managers with a licensing requirement. Increases penalties for violations of the pharmacy benefit managers law. Effective 1/1/2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Pharmacy Benefit Managers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-07SenateThe committee on CPH deferred the measure.
2020-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-07-20 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2020-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 01-31-20 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2020-01-24SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2020-01-21SenateReferred to CPH, JDC.
2020-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1609 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback