HI SB2225 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Re-Referred to WLA, JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Re-Referred to WLA, JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes it unlawful for a person to sell aquatic life acquired through spearfishing.
Title
Maui County Package; Aquatic Life; Spearfishing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to WLA, JDL/WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to WLA/JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1792 (Same As) 2016-02-17 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2225&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2225_.HTM |