HI SB222 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 202, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1330).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 202, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1330).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning 7/1/2022, requires the comptroller's annual report to the governor and legislature to include a list of all accounts that were closed by the comptroller during the immediately preceding fiscal year, and a list of accounts that remain open but that are serving a lapsed program or initiative. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Accounting And General Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | House | Act 202, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1330). |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Act 202, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1330). |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-23 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 131) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 131). |
2021-04-21 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Wakai, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 10:10AM; CR 016. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559). |
2021-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 808). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Wildberger Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Moriwaki Chair; Wakai Co-Chair; Kanuha. |
2021-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 449). |
2021-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1822), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso. |
2021-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-01-21 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1429) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-24 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Ichiyama, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Eli, Mizuno, Woodson. |
2021-03-22 | House | Bill re-scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-24-21 10:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-24-21 11:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-24-21. |
2021-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 03-19-21 11:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to GVR, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 171) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 852) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 354) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 3:05PM in conference room 016. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Annual Reports
Closed Accounts
Comptroller
Department of Accounting and General Services
Lapsed Initiatives
Lapsed Programs
Closed Accounts
Comptroller
Department of Accounting and General Services
Lapsed Initiatives
Lapsed Programs