HI SB2214 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes transit oriented development districts along transit corridors as a community development district, empowers Hawaii community development authority to develop infrastructure in transit oriented development districts, and allows Hawaii community development authority to form public-private partnerships through a lease back arrangement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Rental Housing On Government Lands In Proposed Transit Oriented Development Community Districts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13SenateThe committee on TRE deferred the measure.
2018-02-13SenateThe committee on HOU deferred the measure.
2018-02-13SenateThe committee on WTL deferred the measure.
2018-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on HOU/WTL/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 3:00PM in conference room 225.
2018-01-26SenateRe-Referred to HOU/WTL/TRE, WAM.
2018-01-22SenateReferred to HOU/WTL, WAM.
2018-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-19SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback