HI SB2210 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Beginning on January 1, 2019, requires that any person who is eligible to vote and applies for a new or renewed motor vehicle driver's license, provisional license, instruction permit, limited purpose driver's license, limited purpose provisional driver's license, limited purpose instruction permit, or identification card shall be automatically registered to vote if that person is not already registered to vote; provided that upon receipt of notification from the respective county clerk the applicant shall have twenty-one calendar days to opt-out of automatic voter registration. Makes an appropriation. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Voting.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2018-02-14SenateReported from TRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2295) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2018-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
2018-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, English, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on TRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-18 9:00AM in conference room 225.
2018-01-22SenateReferred to TRE/PSM, JDC/WAM.
2018-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-19SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback