HI SB221 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the governor's coordinator on homelessness, in conjunction with the Hawaii interagency council on homelessness, to develop plans for the city and county of Honolulu and the counties of Hawaii, Kauai, and Maui to coordinate the services and shelter facilities of public agencies and nonprofit organizations to meet the concerns of communities impacted by homelessness and the needs of the homeless population within each county. Requires the county plans to contain specific strategies to address unmet needs in each county. Requires annual reports to the legislature on the status of the county plans. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Homelessness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23HouseThe committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-03-19HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
2021-03-19HouseReported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1038) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-03-16HouseThe committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
2021-03-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-16-21 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 170) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-03-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05SenateOne Day Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 918) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2021-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2021-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2021-02-09SenateReported from HMS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 49) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2021-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on HMS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 3:01PM in conference room Videoconference.
2021-01-25SenateReferred to HMS/PSM, WAM.
2021-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback