HI SB2206 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-15 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Board of Land and Natural Resources to issue revocable month-to-month temporary permits for the temporary emergency sheltering of and facilities for homeless persons on state lands, under certain conditions. Repeals 90 days after the last day of the disaster emergency relief period specified in the Governor's final Supplementary Proclamation relating to the COVID-19 emergency, irrespective of any separate proclamation terminating the disaster emergency relief period in the Governor's final Supplementary Proclamation relating to the COVID-19 emergency. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Homelessness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-15SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2020-07-10HouseReceived notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 633).
2020-07-10SenateSenate agrees with House amendments; passed Final Reading, as amended. Ayes, 25. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
2020-07-08SenateDeferred One Day 07-10-20.
2020-07-06SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 393).
2020-07-06HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-07-02HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 07-06-20.
2020-07-02HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1264-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-06-29HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi.
2020-06-26HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 06-29-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2020-06-25HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2).
2020-06-25HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1219-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-06-24HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott.
2020-06-22HouseProposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 06-24-20 1:30PM in House conference room 325.
2020-03-16HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 10:40AM in conference room 423.
2020-03-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-17-20 10:40AM in House conference room 423.
2020-03-09HouseReferred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HousePass First Reading
2020-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 156) in amended form (SD 2).
2020-03-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3078) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2020-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele.
2020-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:35AM in conference room 211.
2020-02-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2020-02-07SenateReported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2409) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2020-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-01-27SenateThe committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-20 1:25PM in conference room 225.
2020-01-21SenateReferred to HOU, WAM.
2020-01-17SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1817 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback