HI SB2206 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-13 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Awana, Carroll, Saiki, Thielen excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-13 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Awana, Carroll, Saiki, Thielen excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to increase the mandatory retirement age for justices and judges from 70 to 80 years of age.
Title
Judges; Mandatory Retirement Age; Constitutional Amendment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Awana, Carroll, Saiki, Thielen excused (4). | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 976-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Herkes, Ito. | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-08-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-02-08 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 20 | |
2012-02-07 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-02-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 9). | |
2012-02-06 | (S) Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 1). | |
2012-02-06 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Solomon . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kahele). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) One Day Notice 02-06-12. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2016) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-01-24 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |