HI SB2204 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the State Foundation on Culture and the Arts to fund celebrations for the 50th anniversary of the Hawaii state capitol. Requires the State Foundation on Culture and the Arts to use a portion of the appropriated funds to establish a kiosk or shop to disseminate information about the state capitol to visitors to the state capitol. (SB2204 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Fiftieth Anniversary Of The Hawaii State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | The conference committee deferred the measure. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-18 1:05PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-18 1:00PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 794). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; English Co-Chair; Wakai. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: LoPresti, Fukumoto Co-Chairs; Cachola, Cullen, Ward. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 501). |
2018-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1895-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola. |
2018-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 1:35PM in conference room 308. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1492-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-22 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto. |
2018-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 03-22-18 10:20AM in House conference room 429. |
2018-03-20 | House | Re-referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 43 |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to VMI/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 118) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2876) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2288) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-18 9:45AM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2714 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - Referred to VMI/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 9