HI SB2200 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-21 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-21 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires licensed health care providers to make written findings whether a patient or client has a disability and whether the need for an assistance animal or service animal is related to the disability so long as certain circumstances are present. Requires the civil rights commission in consultation with the department of the attorney general to adopt rules and prescribe forms.
Title
Relating To Fair Housing Reasonable Accommodations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-20 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to HOU, CPH/JDC. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Assistance Animals
Civil Rights Commission
Department of the Attorney General
Fair Housing
Health Care Providers
Reasonable Accommodations
Service Animals
Telehealth
Written Findings
Civil Rights Commission
Department of the Attorney General
Fair Housing
Health Care Providers
Reasonable Accommodations
Service Animals
Telehealth
Written Findings
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2200&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2200_.HTM |