HI SB2178 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, Nakashima excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, Nakashima excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DHS to conduct a study on asset limits for public assistance programs. Requires a report to the legislature. Appropriates funds to the Department of Human Services to maintain levels of programs essential to public welfare. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB2178 HD1)
Title
DHS; Public Assistance; Appropriations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, Nakashima excused (3). | |
2012-03-22 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1166-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa, Yamane, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Wooley. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-19-12 10:30AM in conference room 329. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-12 at 10:30am. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-15-12 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 93) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2718) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kim. | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-29-12 9:15AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2248) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-12 1:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Referred to HMS, WAM. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1987 (Same As) 2012-01-19 - (H) Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 2