HI SB2176 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the Hawaii medical marijuana oversight commission. Requires the commission to evaluate the implementation of medical marijuana, including the impact on patients, the effectiveness of regulatory safeguards, and possible areas of expansion for the medical marijuana program. Effective January 1, 2017. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Marijuana; Oversight Commission; Department of Health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-17SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2016-02-17SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2223) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2016-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, Slom.
2016-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-10-16 10:30AM in conference room 229.
2016-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-16 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2016-01-22SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2016-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2016-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback