HI SB2165 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the credit amount and the income eligibility cap thresholds for the income tax credit for low-income household renters by using tax brackets. Provides for inflation increases every 3 years based on the urban Hawaii consumer price index. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Low-income Household Renters Tax Credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - House - House Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1357-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-22 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Clark, LoPresti, McDermott. |
2022-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-22-22 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 147) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2965) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi, Fevella. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-03-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:10AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-22 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1513 (Same As) 2022-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).