HI SB2165 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides a taxpayer who hires an elderly individual a nonrefundable tax credit for the 6-month period after the individual is initially hired by the taxpayer. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2018. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-16SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2018-02-16SenateReported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2415) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2018-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Ihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2018-01-22SenateReferred to LBR, WAM.
2018-01-19SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-19SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1797 (Same As) 2018-01-22 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback