HI SB2158 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Re-referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 25
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Re-referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 25
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows emergency response vehicles to not use sirens if the siren is not reasonably necessary under the circumstances.
Title
Relating To The Use Of Sirens By Emergency Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Re-referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 25 |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 143). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2960) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-28-22 10:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2337) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Riviere. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 2:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |