HI SB2156 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes appointment of judge or justice as Administrative Director of the Courts for no more than two years, and allows the appointed person to retain the salary and benefits of the judicial position. Effective 7/1/2099.
Title
Judiciary; Administrative Director
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 80) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2598) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Hee, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-10 10:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2289) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Gabbard, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-10 9:30am in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Referred to JGO, WAM. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |