HI SB2155 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 34
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 34
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the judiciary to pay a service fee to an electronic payment service provider and to pass the fee on to the customer. (SD1)
Title
Judiciary; Electronic Payment; Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 34 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 79) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2444) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Hee, Kokubun, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-10 10:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2282) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JGO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Gabbard, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-10 9:30am in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Referred to JGO, WAM. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |