HI SB215 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB215
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Education Research and Development Revolving Fund and transfers the unencumbered balances to the general fund as recommended by the Auditor in Auditor's Report No. 16-11.
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-31 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-31-17 3:15PM in conference room 308. |
2017-03-30 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-17. |
2017-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Ichiyama, Souki excused (3). |
2017-03-23 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1241), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-15 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Har, Hashem, Ing, McKelvey, Ohno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan. |
2017-03-15 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-15-17 2:02PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2017-02-22 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-02-21 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 13). |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Tokuda). Transmitted to House. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-21-17. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 538) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-17 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 53) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Espero. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB215 (Carry Over) 2017-03-31 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=215&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB215_.HTM |