HI SB215 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the public-private partnership authority (PPPA). Requires the PPPA to initiate specified pilot projects. Appropriates an unspecified sum for the PPPA. Effective July 1, 2050. Repeals July 1, 2018. (SB215 HD1)
Title
DBEDT; Public-Private Partnership Authority; Pilot Project; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Coffman, Fale, Ing, Onishi, Wooley voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Lowen, Thielen, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from EDB/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1188) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-20 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Lowen, Coffman, Hanohano, Fale; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Kawakami, C. Lee. |
2013-03-20 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Brower, Choy, Ohno, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola. |
2013-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-20-13 8:30AM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-19 | House | The committee(s) on EDB/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-13. |
2013-03-18 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2013-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB/WAL on Tuesday, 03-19-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-03-12 | House | Re-referred to EDB/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2013-03-08 | House | Referred to EDB/WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 395) in amended form (SD 3). |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi . Noes, 5 (Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-13. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report filed. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Separated Committee Report. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 5 offered. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from EDU/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 690) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero, Ruderman ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, L. Thielen. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman, Shimabukuro ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to EGH, EDU/WAM. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Re-Referred to EGH, EDU/HRE/WAM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen). |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 434) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Baker, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Slom, L. Thielen; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, English. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-13 3:15PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EGH, WAM. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB553 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.