HI SB2149 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 33
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 33
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permanently establishes intermediate appellate court judges express authority to subpoena witnesses, compel the production of evidence, and administer oaths.
Title
Intermediate Court of Appeals; Subpoenas; Oaths
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 33 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 74). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) One Day Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2376) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JGO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Gabbard, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-10 9:30am in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Referred to JGO. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |