HI SB2141 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Homeland Security and Resiliency Council to assess the resilience of the State's electric grid and other critical infrastructure to natural disasters and other emergencies and make recommendations. Requires the Council to report to Legislature. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Makes an appropriation. Takes effect 1/1/2042. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Electric Grid Resiliency.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Reported from PSM/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2247) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to PSM/WTL, CPN/WAM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |