HI SB2137 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 155, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1256).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 155, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1256).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health and pertinent county agencies to work together to resolve problems and complaints regarding clean and sober homes. Requires the department of health to educate the public on certain matters related to clean and sober homes. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Transitional Housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Act 155, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1256). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Act 155, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1256). |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22. |
2022-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 59-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 59-22). |
2022-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nakamura, Tam, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-22 5:10PM; Conference Room 329. |
2022-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 894). |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Moriwaki Chair; Keohokalole, Kim Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Tam, Ward. |
2022-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 866). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 530). |
2022-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, McKelvey, Quinlan excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1899-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-30 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Tokioka. |
2022-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-30-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2). |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1274-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-03-17 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 03-17-22 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 138) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2943) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-22 9:45AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from GVO/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2652) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/HTH deferred the measure until 02-15-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to GVO/HTH, JDC. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |