HI SB2137 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-18 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an on-farm mentoring program to teach and train farmers to utilize a whole farm system approach to agriculture. Makes an appropriation to the department of agriculture to support existing on-farm mentoring programs and for a pilot on-farm mentoring program in Maui. Eff. 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture; Food Sustainability; On-farm Mentoring; Appropriation ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-18HouseThe committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2016-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 03-18-16 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2016-03-10HouseReferred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 26
2016-03-10HousePass First Reading
2016-03-08HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 109) in amended form (SD 2).
2016-03-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House.
2016-03-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16.
2016-03-04SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2742) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2016-03-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
2016-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-16 1:40PM in conference room 211.
2016-02-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2016-02-08SenateReported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2075) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2016-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom.
2016-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-16 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2016-01-22SenateReferred to WLA, WAM.
2016-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2016-01-21SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2584 (Same As) 2016-02-01 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 5

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback