HI SB213 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB213

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the requirement for special inspection and certification of reconstructed vehicles prior to operation upon a public highway. Makes conforming amendments. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Motor Vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2020-02-07SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2396) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2020-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
2020-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 02-03-20 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2020-01-24SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-20 1:00PM in conference room 225.
2020-01-21SenateRe-Referred to TRS, JDC.
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-01-22SenateReferred to TRS/PSM, JDC.
2019-01-18SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB431 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB213 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback