HI SB212 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB212
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to GVR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to GVR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the amount of fines that may be assessed against a noncandidate committee for violations of organizational report requirements. Increases the amount of fines that may be assessed against noncandidate committees for violations of advertisement disclosure requirements. Increases the fines for advertisements paid by noncandidate committees making only independent expenditures. Takes effect 7/30/2050. (SD1)
Title
Related To Campaign Finance.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to GVR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-02-03 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-02-02 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 7) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kidani). Transmitted to House. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-02-22. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2005) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-25-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB22 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB212 (Carry Over) 2021-01-25 - Referred to JDC.
SB212 (Carry Over) 2021-01-25 - Referred to JDC.