HI SB2115 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain children under family court jurisdiction to be taken without unnecessary delay to the court or place of shelter designated by the court. Establishes conditions and time limits for placing a minor in room confinement at a detention or adult jail facility. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Room Confinement Of Minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 147-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 147-22). |
2022-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Tam, Har, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 5:00PM; Conference Room 329. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-22 5:00PM; Conference Room 329. |
2022-04-25 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 907). |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Acasio Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Ichiyama, Tam Co-Chairs; Har, Ward. |
2022-04-08 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 459). |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1789-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Wildberger, McDermott. |
2022-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-22 3:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1351-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-03-22 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi. |
2022-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-22-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-18 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1075-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-03-15 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-15-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 133) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3148) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-22 9:45AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2165) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1538 (Same As) 2022-01-26 - Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1