HI SB2113 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates supplemental funds for the Judiciary for the fiscal biennium beginning 7/1/2021 and ending 6/30/2023. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Judiciary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2524) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1536 (Same As) 2022-06-27 - Act 194, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1295).