HI SB211 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Act 046, 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1146).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Ensures that employment, work, and pay eligibility for the purpose of calculating retirement benefits includes retroactive reinstatement, retroactive rescission of suspension, and retroactive payments that are restored to an employee as part of a judicial, administrative, or arbitral proceeding, or pursuant to a settlement of claims. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Employees' Retirement System.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-01SenateAct 046, 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1146).
2023-06-01HouseAct 046, on 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1146).
2023-05-03SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2023-05-04SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900).
2023-05-02HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).
2023-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
2023-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none).
2023-04-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23.
2023-04-28HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 113) as amended in (CD 1).
2023-04-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
2023-04-28SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 113).
2023-04-28HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Tarnas, Garrett, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-04-28SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-04-26SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-28-23 10:40AM; Conference Room 016.
2023-04-27SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 876).
2023-04-25HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi, Tarnas, Garrett Co-Chairs; Alcos.
2023-04-20HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 932).
2023-04-20SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Moriwaki Chair; Keith-Agaran, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Ihara.
2023-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 882).
2023-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2023-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 672).
2023-04-06HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2023-04-06HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2052), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2023-03-31HouseThe committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Poepoe, Alcos.
2023-03-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-31-23 3:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-03-24HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
2023-03-24HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1511) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2023-03-21HouseThe committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2023-03-17HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-21-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-03-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
2023-03-17HouseReported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1313) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2023-03-14HouseThe committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2023-03-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 03-14-23 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-03-09HouseReferred to LGO, JHA, FIN , referral sheet 17
2023-03-09HousePass First Reading
2023-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 105) in amended form (SD 2).
2023-03-07SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2023-03-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
2023-03-03SenateReported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1084) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2023-03-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-03-01SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
2023-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
2023-02-15SenateReported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 342) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC.
2023-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Lee, Ihara, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
2023-01-23SenateReferred to LBT, WAM/JDC.
2023-01-19SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-19SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB101 (Same As) 2023-01-25 - Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 1

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback