HI SB2105 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the examiner of drivers to accept driver's license renewal applications from civilian employees and contractors of the federal Department of Defense more than six months prior to the date of expiration under certain conditions.
Title
Relating To Highway Safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 120). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3131) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:00PM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from TRS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2581) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1813 (Same As) 2020-02-07 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.