HI SB2103 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 255, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1358).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the definitions of "the practice of nursing as a licensed practical nurse" and "the practice of nursing as a registered nurse" to include carrying out the orders of a licensed physician assistant practicing with physician supervision as required by chapter 453, HRS, and acting as an agent of the supervising physician. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health; Licensed Practical Nurse; Registered Nurse; Physician Assistant

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-10 (S) Act 255, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1358).
2012-07-10 (H) Act 255, on 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1358).
2012-05-08 (S) Enrolled to Governor.
2012-05-02 (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 720).
2012-05-01 (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 831).
2012-05-01 (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2012-05-01 (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ching excused (1).
2012-04-26 (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-12.
2012-04-26 (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-12.
2012-04-26 (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 66-12) as amended in (CD 1).
2012-04-26 (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 66-12).
2012-04-26 (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Herkes, M. Lee, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2012-04-26 (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero.
2012-04-25 (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2012-04-24 (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-12 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2012-04-19 (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-12 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2012-04-18 (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-12 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2012-04-17 (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
2012-04-16 (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 752).
2012-04-16 (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Baker, Espero, Co-Chair(s); Slom.
2012-04-16 (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, Herkes Co-Chairs; M. Lee, Ching.
2012-04-12 (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679).
2012-04-12 (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments.
2012-04-12 (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 410).
2012-04-10 (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2012-04-05 (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12.
2012-04-05 (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1556-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2012-04-02 (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Cabanilla, Coffman, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, Tsuji, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Ito, Souki, Marumoto.
2012-03-30 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 04-02-12 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2012-03-20 (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Chang, Herkes, Nakashima, Pine, Tokioka excused (5).
2012-03-20 (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1131-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2012-03-16 (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Jordan, Ching, Pine.
2012-03-13 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-16-12 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
2012-03-08 (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 41
2012-03-08 (H) Pass First Reading
2012-03-06 (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 72) in amended form (SD 2).
2012-03-06 (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2012-03-01 (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12.
2012-03-01 (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2499) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2012-02-24 (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Green, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Solomon, Slom.
2012-02-21 (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-24-12 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2012-02-16 (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
2012-02-16 (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2257) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
2012-02-10 (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2012-02-07 (S) The committee(s) on HTH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-10-12 1:30PM in conference room 229.
2012-02-03 (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-12 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2012-01-20 (S) Referred to HTH, CPN.
2012-01-19 (S) Passed First Reading.
2012-01-19 (S) Introduced.

Hawaii State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2103
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2103_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2103_SD1_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/CommReports/SB2103_SD1_SSCR2257_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2103_SD2_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/CommReports/SB2103_SD2_SSCR2499_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2103_HD1_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/CommReports/SB2103_HD1_HSCR1131-12_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2103_HD2_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/CommReports/SB2103_HD2_HSCR1556-12_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2103_CD1_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/CommReports/SB2103_CD1_CCR66-12_.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback