HI SB2101 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "development" in the Coastal Zone Management Act to exclude construction or reconstruction of a single-family residence that is less than five thousand square feet of floor area and meets other criteria. Defines "floor area" for purposes of the Act.
Title
Relating To The Coastal Zone Management Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1442 (Same As) 2022-01-26 - Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2101&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2101_.HTM |