HI SB2098 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to provide education and support to local businesses regarding compliance with the federal Food and Drug Administration's industry guidance on colored sea salt. Requires private industry businesses to collectively pay 50% of the cost to conduct and submit to the federal Food and Drug Administration any research, studies, or analysis required for federal Food and Drug Administration approval of color additives used in Hawaii sea salt. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Food Safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-06-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Monday, 06-22-20 11:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:30AM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-18-20 10:30AM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-20. |
2020-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-13-20 9:45AM in House conference room 309. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 116) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3077) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from EET/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2688) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-20 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to EET/CPH, WAM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2538 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).