HI SB2096 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the expansion of the department of education's volunteers and partners program into other schools. Requires the DOE to adopt rules and report to the legislature on its progress. (SD1)
Title
DOE; Volunteers and Partners Program; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Reported from EDH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2053) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui, Hemmings. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-10 1:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Referred to EDH, WAM. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2143 (Same As) 2010-02-03 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.