HI SB2084 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the definition of "resident person" under the Hawaii Real Property Tax Act does not include foreign partnerships, foreign limited liability partnerships, foreign limited partnerships, or foreign limited liability companies. Effective 7/1/2050. Applies to real estate dispositions that occur on or after 1/1/2021. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 113) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3012) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-04-20 10:33AM in conference room 211. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-20 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |