HI SB2076 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Office of Hawaiian Affairs consultation with State Historic Preservation Division to delegate to the impacted counties the responsibility for historic preservation project reviews, provided that certain requirements are met. Effective 6/18/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Historic Preservation Reviews.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-11-20 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 107) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Kim. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3145) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-20 12:15PM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from LCA/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2873) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA/WTL deferred the measure until 02-10-20 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-20 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to LCA/WTL, JDC. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to LCA, JDC. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to LCA/PSM, JDC. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |