HI SB2074 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Hawaii to authorize the State legislature to establish a surcharge on taxation of real property near rapid transit stations for the purpose of funding infrastructure improvements in those areas. (SD1)
Title
Proposing An Amendment To The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii To Authorize The Legislature To Establish A Surcharge On Real Property To Fund Infrastructure Improvements Near Rapid Transit Stations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Reconsideration (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM reconsidered its previous decision. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | The committee on WAM will reconsider its previous decision on 02-19-20 and will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:45PM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Moriwaki ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-20 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2684) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Kim ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-04-20 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Constitutional Amendment (ConAm)
Infrastructure Improvement
Real Property
Surcharge
Taxation
Transit-Oriented Development
Infrastructure Improvement
Real Property
Surcharge
Taxation
Transit-Oriented Development