HI SB2072 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Health to require the Department of Education to report coronavirus disease 2019 potential outbreaks or other public health emergencies and related information in a manner most appropriate to public health and safety, as determined by the Department of Health. Repeals the requirement to publish the report on the Department of Education's website. Prohibits the Department of Health from requiring the Department of Education to provide personally identifiable information in any report pursuant to the federal Family Educational Rights and Privacy Act. Authorizes the Department of Education to provide personally identifiable information only after it has determined that a health or safety emergency exists. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5). |
2024-03-15 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1113-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-03-12 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia. |
2024-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 03-12-24 2:30PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-02-13 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-02-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 8) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Richards). Transmitted to House. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-12-24. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2205) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Hashimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, Fevella. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Subjects
COVID-19
DOE
DOH
Family Educational Rights and Privacy Act
Personally Identifiable Information
Report
Schools
DOE
DOH
Family Educational Rights and Privacy Act
Personally Identifiable Information
Report
Schools