HI SB2072 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the court to appoint counsel to indigent parents upon the filing of a petition for custody or family supervision and make every effort to do so at the first hearing attended by the parents. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Court-appointed Attorneys.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-10HouseReferred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 24
2022-03-10HousePass First Reading
2022-03-08HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 120) in amended form (SD 1).
2022-03-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
2022-03-04SenateOne Day Notice 03-08-22.
2022-03-04SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2961) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2022-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole.
2022-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-22 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.
2022-02-17SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2022-02-17SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2410) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2022-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2022-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-22 3:30PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
2022-01-21SenateReferred to HMS, JDC.
2022-01-19SenateIntroduced and passed First Reading.
2022-01-18SenatePending Introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback