HI SB2066 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes federal funds disbursement authority from State Public Charter School Commission. Authorizes the Department of Budget and Finance to disburse federal funds directly to public charter schools. Repeals the exemption for charter schools from requirements on the administration and use of the federal funds allocated to the State for public education purposes.
Title
Relating To Charter Schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1865 (Same As) 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2066&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2066_.HTM |