HI SB2064 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-19 - (S) Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-19 - (S) Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a new chapter to HRS, allowing district court and circuit court judges to order the production of records by persons or entities located outside of the State of Hawaii, in all criminal cases. Requires that anyone in Hawaii served with criminal process from another state must comply with the criminal process.
Title
Production of Records; Prosecuting Attorney Package
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-19 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2012-01-18 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-18 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1777 (Same As) 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 325, 7/10/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1442).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2064 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2064_.HTM |