HI SB206 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that any person who is eligible to vote but is not already registered to vote and applies for a new or renewed motor vehicle driver's license, provisional license, or instruction permit, or a new, renewed, or duplicate civil identification card be automatically registered to vote unless the applicant affirmatively declines to be registered to vote. Authorizes access to and electronic transmission of databases maintained or operated by the counties or the department of transportation containing driver's license or civil identification card information to election officials and the statewide voter registration system. Takes effect on 1/7/2059. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Voting.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2017-02-15SenateReported from JDL/TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 249) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2017-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto.
2017-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
2017-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on JDL/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-17 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2017-01-20SenateReferred to JDL/TRE, WAM.
2017-01-20SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback