HI SB2059 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 43
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 43
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an income tax credit for taxpayers who are required to fill and seal abandoned wells on their real property. Clarifies the definition of the term "abandoned well". Requires sellers of real property to disclose the existence of wells on the property. Effective 7/1/2050. Tax credit applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2020. Tax credit sunsets on an unspecified date. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Well Abandonment.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 43 |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2020-02-19 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 21) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) English, Nishihara). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-18-20. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2739) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Moriwaki, Taniguchi. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-20 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced. |